ST THOMAS CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1096299
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fund raising for education/training for the benefit of the children and school.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £3,755
Total expenditure: £1,816

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 March 2003: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Katherine Thornhill Trustee 01 March 2023
None on record
Teresa Anne Newton Trustee 10 October 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £5.31k £1.77k £1.78k £3.71k £3.76k
Total expenditure £4.69k £1.32k £1.93k £3.90k £1.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 05 October 2024 97 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 19 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
31 Elm Avenue
Sandiacre
NOTTINGHAM
NG10 5EJ
Phone:
07912 343615
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available