EASTON JUBILEE TRUST A WELCOME FOR NEW ARRIVALS

Charity number: 1096962
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 828 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 828 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 05 October 2017 247 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 05 October 2017 247 days late
Annual return 31 March 2015 29 January 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 29 January 2016 On time
Annual return 31 March 2014 17 January 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 22 January 2015 On time