EASTON JUBILEE TRUST A WELCOME FOR NEW ARRIVALS

Charity number: 1096962
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £32.40k £32.55k £28.54k £25.31k £5.62k
Total expenditure £26.61k £27.97k £28.27k £26.90k £20.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A