SEMINGTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1096520
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.47k £1.37k £1.92k £689 £1.10k
Total expenditure £1.27k £1.48k £1.42k £775 £692
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A