Financial history WIMBORNE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity number: 1096535
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £42.94k £24.85k £53.18k £23.94k £19.90k
Total expenditure £27.64k £34.16k £39.57k £24.28k £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A