NEWCASTLE COMMUNITY BUILDINGS NETWORK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NCBN (formerly EECBN) provides advice and support to management committees who run community buildings in Newcastle upon Tyne. Our organisation is run by and for volunteers in voluntary organisations who take on positions of responsibility in their local communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 15 January 2004: Standard registration
- 10 March 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- EAST END COMMUNITY BUILDINGS NETWORK (Working name)
- EECBN (Working name)
- THE NETWORK (Working name)
- EAST END COMMUNITY BUILDINGS NETWORK (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.73k | £1.73k | £1.81k | £1.81k | £736 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 March 2021 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 18 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 NOVEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED 2 DECEMBER 2003 AND 12 JULY 2008
Charitable objects
PROMOTE AND IMPROVE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITABLE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATIONS AND PARTNERSHIPS IN DIRECT PURSUIT OF THEIR OBJECTIVES BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, ADVICE, TRAINING AND INFORMATION ON EFFICIENT AND PROFESSIONAL MANAGEMENT AND BY SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window