POLIO AND CHILDREN IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 1096394
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £51.53k £70.96k £65.67k £62.10k £137.69k
Total expenditure £53.25k £67.93k £44.97k £74.93k £117.80k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A