TRINITY RESOURCE CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1098782
Charity reporting is overdue by 275 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 275 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 275 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 17 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 18 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 29 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 05 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 05 October 2016 On time Download