TRINITY RESOURCE CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1098782
Charity reporting is overdue by 274 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £313.21k £353.60k £336.12k £323.79k £343.14k
Total expenditure £324.13k £367.37k £364.12k £342.02k £347.95k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £95.36k £50.66k £49.73k N/A