NATIONAL GROCERS BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 1095897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £6.62m £6.10m £8.00m £8.31m £9.02m
Total expenditure £6.97m £6.94m £9.22m £9.66m £8.67m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.02m £1.60m £1.81m £1.67m £2.07m
Income - Other trading activities £4.32m £4.20m £0 £6.35m £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £5.86m £0 £6.67m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £275.88k £303.48k £325.79k £293.62k £279.29k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £4.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.49m £4.48m £4.70m £4.66m £4.07m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.48m £2.45m £4.20m £4.63m £4.60m
Expenditure - Governance £103.47k £120.38k £135.66k £301.11k £210.69k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £60.25k £49.31k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £312.17k £359.58k £0