NATIONAL GROCERS BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 1095897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HELEN MARY TUCKER Trustee 19 July 2016 None on record
Louise Anne Stigant Trustee 24 September 2018 None on record
DAVID CLIFFORD WHEELER Trustee 26 May 2017 None on record
Helen Elizabeth Murray Trustee 24 September 2018 None on record
MARK RICHARD WILLIAMSON Trustee 19 July 2016 None on record
JASON CHARLES UTTLEY Trustee 16 February 2016 None on record
DAWOOD PERVEZ Trustee 22 September 2020
THE BESTWAY FOUNDATION Received: On time
MARK PAUL SMITH Trustee 16 December 2013 None on record
Mark McKenzie Trustee 04 February 2020 None on record
BART WALLACE DALLA MURA Trustee None on record
Hayley Tatum Trustee 11 May 2021 None on record
Rhian Helen Bartlett Trustee 22 September 2020 None on record
RUSTON ARTHUR MARK SMITH Chair 21 February 2008 None on record
LORRAINE DENISE HENDLE Trustee 22 November 2016 None on record