EDMUND RICE BICENTENNIAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1098358
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KIERAN TIMOTHY GORDON Trustee 19 February 2018
OPEN AWARDS Received: On time
Theresa Oldham Trustee 01 May 2020 None on record
Br Amandi Mboya Trustee 31 March 2021 None on record
Paul Griffiths Trustee 26 October 2015 None on record
Br Clement Sindazi Mukuka Trustee 10 October 2014 None on record
MARK VINCENT HOLLAND Trustee 02 December 2008 None on record
Br Julian McDonald Trustee 10 October 2014 None on record
Br Joseph Johnson Trustee 14 May 2018 None on record
Br George Gordon Trustee 10 October 2014 None on record