PARENTS & ADDICTS AGAINST NARCOTICS IN THE COMMUNITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Panic grew out of local need when two mothers established a self help group. This has now grown into a recognised model of good practice. We provide individually tailored packages of support to enable families to to deal with the issues that arise from addiction, within their everyday lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of York
- North Yorkshire
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 16 June 2003: Standard registration
- 23 July 2014: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 23 July 2014: Funds transferred to 1154630 BRIDGES TEES VALLEY
- P.A.N.I.C. (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £547.83k | £378.31k | £388.55k | £330.68k | £287.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £481.60k | £371.43k | £329.72k | £253.76k | £275.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £546.23k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.60k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £451.59k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £30.01k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 11 November 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 08 November 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 17 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 17 December 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 04 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 04 January 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON THE 1 JANUARY 2000 AS AMENDED ON THE 12 APRIL 2003
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND WITH A VIEW TO PUBLIC PROTECTION AND THE PRESERVATION OF PUBLIC ORDER, THE PROVISION OF SERVICES DIRECTED TOWARDS THE PREVENTION OF DRUG ABUSE AND THE RELIEF, SUPPORT AND ESPECIALLY THE REHABILITATION OF PEOPLE WITH ADDICTIVE BEHAVIOURS 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF VOLUNTARY AND STATUARY AGENCIES AND THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF DRUG ABUSE AND ADDICTIVE BEHAVIOURS, ITS CAUSES, REMEDIES AND PREVENTION
Area of benefit
THOSE DISTRICTS WITHIN ENGLAND CURRENTLY KNOWN AS MIDDLESBOROUGH, STOCKTON, REDCAR AND CLEVELAND AND HARTLEPOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window