Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST THOMAS OF CANTERBURY, EAST CLANDON

Charity number: 1096354
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £13.30k £4.59k £7.09k £2.93k £2.47k
Total expenditure £13.95k £6.43k £7.66k £3.19k £11.88k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A