Trustees THE FRIENDS OF ST THOMAS OF CANTERBURY, EAST CLANDON

Charity number: 1096354
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Murray James Boyd Dudgeon Chair 22 February 2021
None on record
Sally Novell Trustee 28 April 2020
None on record
Andrew Hay Trustee 14 January 2020
None on record
Julie Eves Trustee 23 April 2019
THE ROYAL GRAMMAR SCHOOL, GUILDFORD FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Chris Ross Trustee 20 March 2018
None on record
Lesley Pitt Trustee 12 June 2014
LEARNING SPACE
Received: On time
REV Barnaby Perkins Trustee 03 December 2013
WEST CLANDON PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
JAMES HEITLAND CULMER Trustee 06 January 2006
None on record
LOUISE ROBERTSON Trustee 06 January 2006
None on record