Trustees THE GARAGE TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 1098975

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Myra Guy | Chair | 09 November 2020 |
|
|||||
John GORDON-SAKER | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Crompton-Howes | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Angela Bush | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Michael Launchbury | Trustee | 13 November 2017 |
|
|||||
VIVIAN CHINASA EZUGHA | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE WARR | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY GILKS | Trustee | 14 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Hamilton | Trustee | 21 March 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.