THE ST NEOTS & DISTRICT U3A

Charity number: 1096143
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 18 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 18 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 19 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 19 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 21 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 22 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 10 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 10 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 20 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 20 October 2016 On time Download