THE ST NEOTS & DISTRICT U3A

Charity number: 1096143
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £32.79k £42.60k £41.68k £69.20k £41.97k
Total expenditure £29.78k £35.15k £37.02k £73.72k £43.03k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A