The Priory School PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds through various activities (eg. fairs, sponsored spells, quiz nights) to provide additional items and experiences for the children of the Priory Primary School in order to further enhance their education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

22 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
Governance
- 24 February 2003: Standard registration
- THE PRIORY SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hollee Louise Vivian | Chair | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Taryn Byett | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stacey Michele Moody | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Preety Singh | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michaela Claire Stacey-Hayes | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kayleigh Butler | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Elizabeth Gordon | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keely Todd | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Catherine Elizabeth Forbes | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shelley Thomson | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Teri Heathcote | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Farrow-Gent | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emily Elizabeth Taylor | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Sarah Clint | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Jane Clarke | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Emma Jeavons | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Marie Crane | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Beddoe Beldom | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katarina Mingacova | Trustee | 28 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Price | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Candy | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Cripps | Trustee | 14 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.70k | £20.93k | £23.78k | £29.00k | £22.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.31k | £24.13k | £36.27k | £25.23k | £18.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 20 October 2023 | 112 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 JANUARY 2003 as amended on 14 Sep 2017 as amended on 02 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
THE PRIORY PRIMARY SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Priory Primary School
Pamber End
TADLEY
RG26 5QD
- Phone:
- 01256850062
- Email:
- prioryptatreasurer@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window