BOREHAMWOOD AND ELSTREE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (U3A)

Charity number: 1096170
Charity reporting is overdue by 228 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 228 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 228 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 01 February 2017 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required