BOREHAMWOOD AND ELSTREE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (U3A)

Charity number: 1096170
Charity reporting is overdue by 236 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Juidth Sear Trustee 18 September 2018 None on record
Sue Radford Trustee 18 September 2018 None on record
Shirley Boland Trustee 19 September 2017 None on record
Stuart TARRANT Chair 15 September 2015 None on record
LYNDA MARSHALL Trustee 23 October 2012 None on record
Christine Manning Trustee 01 October 2019 None on record
BETTY JOAN CHANDLER Trustee
ELSTREE & BOREHAMWOOD MUSEUM Received: On time
MR CHRIS ANDERSON Trustee None on record
Andrew Whittington Trustee 18 September 2018 None on record
GLORIA KATHLEEN BAKALL Trustee None on record