THE GEN INITIATIVE LIMITED

Charity number: 1101193
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £33.66k £43.93k £26.82k £23.26k £24.50k
Total expenditure £40.24k £28.78k £36.90k £25.81k £20.13k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A