ANIM-MATES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the suffering and distress of animals in need of care and attention in north-west Kent in any or all of the following ways: a)to rescue, rehabilitate and rehome stray, abandoned and unwanted animals. b)to provide long term foster care for homeless animals. c)to provide veterinary treatment, vaccination, neutering and spaying where necessary.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
43 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 27 June 2003: Standard registration
- 02 September 2022: Funds received from 1101341 FAVERSHAM ANIMAL WELFARE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Bajwa | Trustee | 08 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Stanley White | Trustee | 21 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN PEIRCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TERESA BLOOMFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £112.86k | £143.78k | £178.71k | £109.75k | £77.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.31k | £95.44k | £81.08k | £144.82k | £133.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2 DECEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 4 JUNE 2003
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION IN SOUTH EAST ENGLAND IN ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS:- (A) TO RESCUE, REHABILITATE AND RE-HOME STRAY, ABANDONED AND UNWANTED ANIMALS. (B) TO PROVIDE LONG TERM FOSTER CARE FOR HOMELESS ANIMALS. (C) TO PROVIDE VETERINARY TREATMENT, VACCINATION, NEUTERING AND SPAYING WHERE NECESSARY.
Area of benefit
SOUTH EAST ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Olivers Farm
Butchers Lane
Ash
SEVENOAKS
TN15 7HF
- Phone:
- 07743 331397
- Email:
- info@anim-mates.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window