AFRICAN AGRICULTURAL TECHNOLOGY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1107507
Charity reporting is overdue by 87 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 87 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 87 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 December 2020 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 December 2020 53 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 October 2020 354 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 19 October 2020 354 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 09 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 25 October 2017 On time Download