SOUTH OF ENGLAND FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1096222
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 15 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 13 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 10 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 10 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 06 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 04 November 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)