EVERTON IN THE COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1099366
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 07 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 07 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 23 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 23 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 30 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 30 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 23 April 2018 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 23 April 2018 23 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2016 22 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 22 January 2017 On time Download