THE TURNEY TRUST

Charity number: 1097415
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 05 April 2019 20 February 2020 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 20 February 2020 15 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 22 February 2019 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 22 February 2019 17 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 12 February 2018 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 12 February 2018 7 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 06 April 2017 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

06 April 2017 60 days late Download