THE TURNEY TRUST

Charity number: 1097415
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2015 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019
Total gross income £67.73k £73.16k £80.13k £74.28k £74.28k
Total expenditure £48.76k £25.65k £48.72k £61.45k £61.45k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A