Accounts and annual returns ST MARY'S PLAYGROUP (CHURCHDOWN)

Charity number: 1097701
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 23 September 2022 12 July 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 23 September 2022 12 July 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 23 September 2021 31 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 23 September 2021 31 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 23 September 2020 15 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 23 September 2020 15 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 23 September 2019 11 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 23 September 2019 21 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 23 September 2018 17 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 23 September 2018 17 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window