Financial history ST MARY'S PLAYGROUP (CHURCHDOWN)

Charity number: 1097701
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 23/09/2018 23/09/2019 23/09/2020 23/09/2021 23/09/2022
Total gross income £63.49k £66.07k £70.63k £42.45k £43.43k
Total expenditure £56.39k £63.19k £64.46k £52.75k £57.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A