Trustees INTERNATIONAL AGENCY FOR THE PREVENTION OF BLINDNESS

Charity number: 1100559
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

28 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Katherine Overbey Trustee 03 June 2021
ONE SIGHT FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Kevin Hassey Trustee 03 June 2021
None on record
Martine Abel- Williamson Trustee 03 June 2021
None on record
Wolfgang Gindorfer Trustee 03 June 2021
None on record
Elizabeth Kurian Trustee 03 June 2021
None on record
Nicholas Kourgialis Trustee 03 June 2021
None on record
Dr Fatima Kyari Trustee 03 June 2021
None on record
Dr Rainer Brockhaus Trustee 03 June 2021
None on record
Dr Wei He Trustee 03 June 2021
None on record
Derek Hodkey Trustee 03 June 2021
None on record
Dr Abdulaziz AIRajhi Trustee 03 June 2021
None on record
Jessica Blijkers Trustee 03 June 2021
None on record
Dr Caroline Casey Trustee 03 June 2021
None on record
Dr Neeru Guta Trustee 01 April 2019
None on record
Dr Marcus Ang Trustee 28 February 2019
None on record
Dr Rohit Khanna Trustee 13 September 2018
None on record
Prof Haidong Zou Trustee 05 May 2017
None on record
Debra Davis Trustee 27 October 2016
RELIEF INTERNATIONAL UK
Received: On time
VISION FOR A NATION FOUNDATION
Received: 3 days late
Dr Scott Gordon Mundle Trustee 27 October 2016
None on record
Dr Aaron Thembinkosi Magava Trustee 27 October 2016
None on record
Dr Suzanne Gilbert Trustee 27 October 2016
None on record
Dr Francisco Guillermo Martinez Trustee 27 October 2016
None on record
Kashinath Bhoosnurmath Trustee 27 October 2016
None on record
Dr Muhammad Babar Qureshi Trustee 10 May 2016
None on record
AMANDA DAVIS BBVS Trustee 10 May 2016
None on record
Job Heintz Trustee 31 March 2015
None on record
Jennifer Gersbeck Trustee 29 March 2015
None on record
Dr CAROLINE ANNE HARPER Trustee
None on record