FAMILY REFUGEE SUPPORT PROJECT

Charity number: 1098825
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £119.88k £130.43k £144.10k £134.52k £149.55k
Total expenditure £95.29k £132.29k £135.16k £124.91k £162.16k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £32.08k £25.57k £113.30k £103.41k £125.41k