FAMILY REFUGEE SUPPORT PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work with parents and other adults who have suffered the traumatising effects of war, torture and displacement. Through our work with refugees and people seeking asylum, we seek to improve their life chances and their mental health and wellbeing. We provide therapy, often with horticulture. We also offer practical support with benefits, education and housing matters.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £182,960 from 1 government contract(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- Wigan
- Wirral
Governance
- 31 July 2003: Standard registration
- FRSP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ERIC PETER FELL | Chair | 20 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Emily Ross | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Kit Oi Chung | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Alice Buchanan | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Jane Gordon | Trustee | 05 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr HELEN MARGARET McKENDRICK | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
KAREN JONASON | Trustee | 23 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT LESLIE WAUGH | Trustee | 17 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £134.52k | £149.55k | £286.44k | £292.03k | £307.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £124.91k | £162.16k | £223.87k | £240.87k | £263.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £132.88k | £163.42k | £182.96k | |
|
Income from government grants | £103.41k | £125.41k | £60.21k | £4.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 JANUARY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 27 MARCH 2003.
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL HEALTH OF REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS IN MERSEYSIDE WHO ARE SUFFERING THE EFFECTS OF EXILE AND PERSECUTION IN PARTICULAR ALTHOUGH NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE THERAPEUTIC USE OF HORTICULTURE.
Area of benefit
MERSEYSIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
FAMILY REFUGEE SUPPORT PROJECT
Toxteth Town Hall
15 High Park Street
LIVERPOOL
L8 8DX
- Phone:
- 01517289340
- Email:
- info@frsp.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window