Financial history ST ANNE'S TRUST

Charity number: 1097471
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £61.90k £34.90k £59.40k £60.65k £18.17k
Total expenditure £45.23k £44.70k £41.12k £44.65k £89.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £3.53k N/A N/A