ZNANIYE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1101796
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 01 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 February 2019 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 March 2018 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required