Financial history BROMYARD BOWMEN

Charity number: 1101847
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £17.73k £10.68k £12.65k £12.35k £11.80k
Total expenditure £11.52k £8.91k £11.96k £9.38k £5.44k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £3.00k N/A