Financial history CORNWALL MOBILITY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1096745
Charity reporting is up to date (36 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.01m £985.26k £1.01m £887.10k £999.19k
Total expenditure £1.05m £992.81k £999.34k £854.30k £1.08m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £326.83k £385.35k £356.66k £660.35k £360.41k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.14k £0 £2.00k £207.49k £9.84k
Income - Other trading activities £23.75k £11.36k £9.62k £7.00k £15.15k
Income - Charitable activities £953.50k £954.43k £980.32k £632.92k £944.54k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £19.94k £18.37k £18.01k £15.24k £13.71k
Income - Other £10.36k £1.09k £2.91k £24.46k £15.95k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.05m £992.81k £999.34k £854.30k £1.08m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £1.50k £11.99k £12.37k £11.47k £15.90k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0