CANBURY COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1098440
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £15.92k £14.33k £16.40k £19.02k £15.06k
Total expenditure £14.04k £23.02k £12.42k £18.21k £11.93k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k