ST MARY'S WESTERHAM HERITAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1096839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kevin Willcox Trustee 31 October 2016 None on record
Judith Ellen Duffield Trustee 03 November 2018 None on record
Arthur Charles Nigel Bailey Trustee 26 June 2019 None on record
David Charles Griffiths Chair 02 October 2019 None on record
Francis Helen Ogden Trustee 31 October 2015 None on record
Bridget Teresa Hales Trustee 03 November 2018 None on record
REV KEVIN PAUL BARNARD Trustee 31 October 2015
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN PARISH CHURCH WESTERHAM KENT Received: On time
Karen Smart Trustee 31 October 2016 None on record
Heather Margaret O'Neill Trustee 31 October 2016 None on record
MR TONY YORK Trustee None on record