Financial history RONTADES LIMITED

Charity number: 1096584
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £2.40m £2.59m £2.41m £2.52m £2.56m
Total expenditure £1.05m £1.14m £1.71m £2.03m £3.19m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £114.40k £115.66k £102.00k £95.00k £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.28m £2.40m £2.30m £2.43m £2.56m
Income - Other £0 £83.48k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £805.84k £878.25k £1.43m £1.79m £3.00m
Expenditure - Raising funds £240.41k £258.85k £275.25k £232.22k £190.38k
Expenditure - Governance £29.56k £29.30k £30.03k £30.14k £29.01k
Expenditure - Grants institution £776.28k £848.95k £1.40m £1.76m £2.98m
Expenditure - Investment management £240.41k £258.85k £275.25k £232.22k £190.38k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0