TOWER HAMLETS FRIENDS AND NEIGHBOURS

Charity number: 1099403
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 01 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 01 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 10 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 17 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 15 August 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 24 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 17 August 2016 On time Download