TOWER HAMLETS FRIENDS AND NEIGHBOURS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advocacy and Befriending service for socially isolated and lonely older people living in the borough of Tower Hamlets
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £39,584 from 2 government contract(s) and £39,584 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of London
- Hackney
- Newham
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 12 September 2003: Standard registration
- FRIENDS AND NEIGHBOURS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne WORLLEDGE | Chair | 01 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Muhammad Jaber Hasan Khan | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Theophile | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Elizabeth Caroline Skeels | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Emery Robarts | Trustee | 10 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carl Steventon | Trustee | 22 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £176.40k | £250.30k | £250.30k | £128.24k | £159.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £180.73k | £186.03k | £186.03k | £207.31k | £189.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £25.00k | £50.00k | £50.00k | N/A | £39.58k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £50.00k | £39.58k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/02/2003 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09/07/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02/09/2014
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS, AMONG THOSE RESIDENT WITHIN THE BOUNDARIES OF THE FORMER BOROUGH OF STEPNEY AND MORE GENERALLY GREATER LONDON, BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH SUPPORT (IN PARTICULAR TO THE ELDERLY, ISOLATED AND VULNERABLE) AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME CONSIDER APPROPRIATE.
Area of benefit
THOSE WHO LIVE IN THE FORMER BOROUGH OF STEPNEY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MARGARETS HOUSE SETTLEMENT
21 OLD FORD ROAD
LONDON
E2 9PL
- Phone:
- 0203 007 9120
- Email:
- admin@thfn.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window