TOWER HAMLETS FRIENDS AND NEIGHBOURS

Charity number: 1099403
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Pam Rachel Kaur Gibbons Trustee 23 March 2021 None on record
Carl Steventon Trustee 22 April 2020 None on record
Christopher Philip Bingham Trustee 22 April 2020 None on record
Amanda Goh Trustee 01 January 2016 None on record
GEMMA ROYE Chair 01 January 2016 None on record
ANTHONY JAMES HARDIE Trustee
QUEEN ADELAIDE'S CHARITY Received: On time
Stephen Emery Robarts Trustee 10 June 2020 None on record
Kirsty Sanders Trustee 01 February 2018 None on record
Anne WORLLEDGE Trustee 01 April 2016
MERTON HOME TUTORING SERVICE Received: On time
BOW FOODBANK Received: On time