FRIENDS OF BRIDGETOWN SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supports Bridgetown School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income includes £145 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 27 March 2003: Standard registration
- FOBS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Birrell | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Chaperlin | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
LISA PINKERTON | Trustee | 01 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.75k | £34.22k | £11.13k | £22.97k | £21.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.13k | £58.77k | £27.90k | £20.18k | £27.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £150 | N/A | N/A | £950 | £145 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 22 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 22 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 16 June 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 16 June 2020 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 JANUARY 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS;
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE BRIDGETOWN PRIMARY SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bridgetown Primary School
Byron Road
Stratford-upon-Avon
CV37 7JP
- Phone:
- 01789205092
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window