Financial history BEAP

Charity number: 1098088
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £154.93k £209.50k £236.68k £209.58k £518.07k
Total expenditure £130.18k £154.07k £218.14k £248.49k £208.04k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A £70.00k £40.00k
Income from government grants £0 N/A £30.98k £4.50k £127.30k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £449.45k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £68.62k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £4
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £208.04k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.56k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0