City of Cambridge Symphony Orchestra

Charity number: 1096457
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £40.58k £39.87k £42.54k £38.04k £24.95k
Total expenditure £42.82k £39.39k £39.37k £39.36k £28.94k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A