THE FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF NORTH STONEHAM AND BASSETT,SOUTHAMPTON

Charity number: 1097269
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £2.83k £2.13k £2.64k £11.90k £4.87k
Total expenditure £237 £38 £8.11k £146 £167
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A