Financial history NEW LIFE CHURCH (NORTH LONDON)

Charity number: 1097140
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £128.81k £160.68k £169.93k £115.83k £2.62m
Total expenditure £130.37k £146.19k £177.51k £88.22k £103.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £2.12k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.62m
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.30k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £12
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £103.00k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0