BELMONT PARISH HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1098406
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 16 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 22 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 24 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 24 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 26 July 2017 On time Download