Accounts and annual returns REFUGEE RESOURCE

Charity number: 1098876
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 10 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 22 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 22 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 28 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window